IL HB5175 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Failed on November 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-29 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Failed on November 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-29 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that, beginning July 1, 2019, in fixing the salaries of teachers, a school board shall pay those who serve on a full-time basis a rate not less than $40,000 per year. Removes a provision providing for a periodic teacher salary increase schedule. Makes conforming changes.
Title
SCH CD-TEACHER SALARY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-28 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-14 - House - Motion in House (Y: 71 N: 34 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 64 N: 40 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 61 N: 38 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-11-14 - House - Motion in House (Y: 71 N: 34 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 64 N: 40 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 61 N: 38 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-29 | House | Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Override Governor Veto - Senate Lost 031-014-000 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Placed Calendar Total Veto |
2018-11-28 | House | Motion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2018-11-14 | House | Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2018-11-14 | House | Override Governor Veto - House Passed 071-034-002 |
2018-11-14 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-14 | House | Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-11-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Total Veto |
2018-08-24 | House | Governor Vetoed |
2018-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 064-040-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 036-014-001 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Cunningham |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-003-000 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 008-002-000 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-04-26 | House | Verified |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 061-038-001 |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-04-26 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 006-003-000 |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2018-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000 |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 24-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |