IL HB5170 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Changes references in the Code from "English Language Learner" to "English Learner" and from "vocational education" to "career and technical education". Repeals a provision providing that it is unlawful for any county superintendent of schools to practice any other profession. Makes other changes regarding Early Childhood Education Block Grant reports, reports on the conditions of schools, suspension or revocation of an educator license, charter school reports, and powers and duties of the State Board of Education.
Title
SCD CD-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Rep. David Olsen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-14 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-14 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 015-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2018-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-02-26 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-22.31b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 10-23.3a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 10-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 11E-130 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 13-41 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 14-8.03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 14C-13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 17-2.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 18-8.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 18-8.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 19-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 1A-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 1C-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.172 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.71a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.83 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 24A-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27-22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27-22.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27A-12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 3-3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-225 | Amended Code | Citation Text |