IL HB5166 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Provides that notice to parties in a contested case under the Act shall be served, among other forms of service, by email. Provides that parties in a contested case under the Act shall be notified, among other forms of notification, by email of any decision or order in that case. Provides for specified requirements for the consent of service by email. Provides that an agency may request, but not require, unless otherwise required by law, an unrepresented party to designate an email address to which specified documents may be transmitted. Provides that no document described in specified provisions may be served by email to the extent the documents contains certain specified information. Provides that service by email is deemed complete on the day of transmission. Provides that agencies that use email to service documents shall adopt rules that specify the standard for confirming delivery, and in failure to confirm delivery, what steps the agency will take to ensure that service by email or other means is accomplished.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEDURE-EMAIL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-26SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-26SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-001-000
2018-04-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 018-000-000
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2018-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 024-000-000
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
510010-25Amended CodeCitation Text
510010-50Amended CodeCitation Text
510010-75New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback