IL HB5164 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Act on the Aging. Requires the Department on Aging to establish and implement a Community Care Program Medicaid Initiative to: provide targeted funding to care coordination units to help seniors complete applications for medical assistance benefits under the State's Medical Assistance program; provide a funding pool to help care coordination units make improvements to the application process; establish requirements for State agencies to make enrollment in the Medical Assistance program easier for seniors; and other matters. Creates the Community Care Program Medicaid Enrollment Oversight Task Force to make recommendations on how best to increase the number of Illinois residents who are enrolled in the Community Care Program and receive services not paid for under the Medical Assistance program although they may be eligible for benefits. Provides for the membership of the Task Force. Requires the Task Force to provide oversight to the Initiative and to meet quarterly to provide the Department with data on the number of persons who receive Community Care Program services and are eligible for medical assistance but are not enrolled in the Medical Assistance program. Requires the Department to publish such data on its website and to collaborate with other agencies to determine how best to achieve the responsibilities of the Initiative. Establishes payment incentives to care coordination units that assist seniors in completing medical assistance applications. Provides that the Initiative shall cease operation 5 years after the effective date of the amendatory Act, after which the Task Force shall dissolve.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AGING-MEDICAID INITIATIVE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Aging Committee; 011-002-001
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Aging Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-04-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-04-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Aging Committee; 012-001-000
2018-04-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Aging Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Aging Committee
2018-04-02HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-02HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Aging Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
201054.02Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback