IL HB5163 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the County Care for Persons with Developmental Disabilities Act. Changes the short title of the Act to the Community Care for Persons with Developmental Disabilities Act. Makes the Act applicable to counties, municipalities, and townships (rather than just counties). Adds definitions, including "developmental disability". Allows the board of directors to add to the definition of "developmental disability" in its jurisdiction by a majority vote. Provides that the changes do not affect any established county community developmental disability boards. Provides that the Act will be reassigned to 50 ILCS 835. Amends the Property Tax Code and the Counties Code making conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COMMUNITY CARE-DISABILITIES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 007-004-000
2018-04-11HouseReported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee;
2018-04-11HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 003-001-000
2018-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-03-08HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2018-03-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-02-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-02-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520018-195Amended CodeCitation Text
551050.01Amended CodeCitation Text
551050.05New CodeSee Bill Text
551051Amended CodeCitation Text
551051.1Amended CodeCitation Text
551051.2Amended CodeCitation Text
5510511Amended CodeCitation Text
5510514New CodeSee Bill Text
551053Amended CodeCitation Text
551054Amended CodeCitation Text
551055Amended CodeCitation Text
551057Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-1024Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-44020Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback