IL HB5163 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the County Care for Persons with Developmental Disabilities Act. Changes the short title of the Act to the Community Care for Persons with Developmental Disabilities Act. Makes the Act applicable to counties, municipalities, and townships (rather than just counties). Adds definitions, including "developmental disability". Allows the board of directors to add to the definition of "developmental disability" in its jurisdiction by a majority vote. Provides that the changes do not affect any established county community developmental disability boards. Provides that the Act will be reassigned to 50 ILCS 835. Amends the Property Tax Code and the Counties Code making conforming changes.
Title
COMMUNITY CARE-DISABILITIES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 007-004-000 |
2018-04-11 | House | Reported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee; |
2018-04-11 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 003-001-000 |
2018-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-03-08 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-02-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 18-195 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 105 | 0.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 105 | 0.05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 105 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 105 | 1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 105 | 1.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 105 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 105 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 105 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 105 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 105 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 105 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1024 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-44020 | Amended Code | Citation Text |