IL HB5162 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Citizen Participation Act. Changes the definition of "motion". Provides that the intent of the responding party in bringing the claim is not taken into account for any motion to dispose of a claim on the grounds that the claim is in response to any act of the moving party in furtherance of the moving party's rights of petition, speech, association, or to otherwise participate in government. Provides that unless a court finds that the responding party has shown by a preponderance of the evidence a probability (rather than "produced clear and convincing evidence") that the acts of the moving party are not immunized from liability of this Act a court shall grant a motion to dispose of a claim on the grounds that the claim is in response to any act of the moving party in furtherance of the moving party's rights of petition, speech, association, or to otherwise participate in government and dismiss the claim.
Title
CITIZEN PARTICIPATION-MOTION
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Breen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Scott Drury |
2018-04-26 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Scott Drury |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 008-002-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2018-04-10 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-03-23 | House | To Civil Procedure Subcommittee |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 110 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 110 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 110 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5162&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5162.htm |