IL HB5160 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Creates the Domestic Stock Company Division Article in the Code. Provides that a domestic stock company may divide into 2 or more resulting companies pursuant to a plan of division. Contains provisions concerning the contents of the plan of division, approval of the plan of division by the Director of Insurance, effects of a division, certificates of division, liabilities, and shareholder rights. Makes conforming changes in provisions concerning mergers and consolidations.
Title
INS CD-DOMESTIC STOCK COMPANY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2018-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-20 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance: Property & Casualty Committee; 008-000-000 |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2018-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance: Property & Casualty Committee |
2018-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance: Property & Casualty Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-02-26 | House | Assigned to Insurance: Property & Casualty Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 156 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 35B-1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 5 | 35B-10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 5 | 35B-15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 5 | 35B-20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 5 | 35B-25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 5 | 35B-30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 5 | 35B-35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 5 | 35B-40 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 5 | 35B-45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 5 | 35B-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 5 | 35B-50 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 5 | Art. IIB heading | New Code | See Bill Text |