IL HB5159 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Secretary of State shall establish or adopt an electronic system to allow an automotive recycler, scrap processor, repairer, or rebuilder to submit a report of any transaction that involves a vehicle or vehicle part to the Secretary of State and complete a real time inquiry to verify that a vehicle or vehicle part has not been stolen. Requires that a report of any transaction involving a vehicle or vehicle part shall be submitted to the Secretary within 48 hours of each day's close of business with specific information included. Provides that, without charge and upon request, the Secretary shall make the report available to any law enforcement agency. Provides that the Secretary shall forward the report to the National Motor Vehicle Title Information System within 2 business days of its receipt. Provides that prior to the purchase of a vehicle or vehicle part, an automotive recycler, scrap processor, repairer, or rebuilder shall determine whether a vehicle or vehicle part has been reported stolen. Provides procedures for an automotive recycler, scrap processor, repairer, or rebuilder for how to proceed with a transaction regarding a vehicle or vehicle part that has or has not been reported stolen.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-JUNK/SCRAP DATABASE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-14HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-14HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-000-000
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62555-403.2New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback