IL HB5158 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
Pending: House Appropriations-Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Makes various appropriations to the Department of Children and Family Services for payments for the care of children served by private agencies under contract with the Department and for cost of care reimbursements to foster parents. Effective July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$DCFS-YOUTH IN CARE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-27HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback