IL HB5157 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on August 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0959
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that after the court has placed a minor in the care of a temporary custodian, any party may apply to the court to grant the temporary custodian the authority to serve as a surrogate decision maker for the minor under the Health Care Surrogate Act for purposes of making the decision whether to forgo life-sustaining treatment, if the court determines by clear and convincing evidence that it is in the best interests of the minor to grant the temporary custodian such authority. Provides that in making its determination, the court shall consider specified factors, the efforts made to engage the respondents in decision making on behalf of the child, evidence of the impact of a delay in decision making on the child, and any other factors the court deems relevant to a determination of the best interests of the minor. Provides that if the Department of Children and Family Services is the temporary custodian of the minor, in addition to specified requirements, the Department shall follow its rules and procedures in exercising authority granted under the new provisions. Amends the Health Care Surrogate Act. To the list of surrogate decision makers, adds the patient's temporary custodian appointed under the Juvenile Court Act of 1987 if the court has entered an order granting such authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SURROGATE HEALTH DECISIONS-JUV

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-19HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0959
2018-08-19HouseEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-19HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-22HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-24HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-05-01SenateWaive Posting Notice
2018-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-04-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-000-000
2018-04-17HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-04-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000
2018-04-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-10HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2018-04-10HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 002-001-000
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-04-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-03-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-03-23HouseTo Domestic Relations Law Subcommittee
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7054052-10Amended CodeCitation Text
7554025Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback