IL HB5150 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012 and the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Transfers the reporting requirement by the State's Attorney under the Criminal Code of 2012 concerning the use of consensual eavesdropping devices under certain circumstances to the consensual eavesdropping reporting provisions of the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that the report shall be due on February 1 of each year, with State's Attorney submitting this report to the Department of State Police (rather than the General Assembly). Requires the eavesdropping reports by the Department of State Police to be filed with the General Assembly on March 1 of each year (rather than April 1) and include the consensual eavesdropping report of the State's Attorneys.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM PRO-CONSENSUAL EAVESDROP

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-16SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading May 2, 2018
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-002
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-18HouseMotion Withdrawn Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2018-04-12HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-04-12HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-10HouseMotion Filed to Discharge Committee Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2018-04-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720514-3Amended CodeCitation Text
7255108A-11Amended CodeCitation Text
7255108B-13Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback