IL HB5150 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012 and the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Transfers the reporting requirement by the State's Attorney under the Criminal Code of 2012 concerning the use of consensual eavesdropping devices under certain circumstances to the consensual eavesdropping reporting provisions of the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that the report shall be due on February 1 of each year, with State's Attorney submitting this report to the Department of State Police (rather than the General Assembly). Requires the eavesdropping reports by the Department of State Police to be filed with the General Assembly on March 1 of each year (rather than April 1) and include the consensual eavesdropping report of the State's Attorneys.
Title
CRIM PRO-CONSENSUAL EAVESDROP
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 2, 2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-002 |
2018-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-18 | House | Motion Withdrawn Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-04-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000 |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-10 | House | Motion Filed to Discharge Committee Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2018-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 14-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 108A-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 108B-13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |