IL HB5148 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that course material and instruction in a sex education course shall include, with an emphasis on the workplace environment and life on a college campus, material and discussion on what constitutes sexual consent and what may be considered sexual harassment or sexual assault. Effective July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-SEX ED-SEXUAL CONSENT

Sponsors

Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D]Rep. Katie Stuart [D]Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie [D]Rep. Monica Bristow [D]
Rep. Deborah Conroy [D]Rep. Camille Lilly [D]Rep. Sue Scherer [D]Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D]
Rep. Sam Yingling [D]Rep. Al Riley [D]Rep. Emanuel Welch [D]Rep. Christian Mitchell [D]
Rep. Kelly Burke [D]Rep. John D'Amico [D]Rep. Luis Arroyo [D]Rep. Kathleen Willis [D]
Rep. Litesa Wallace [D]Rep. Sonya Harper [D]Rep. Juliana Stratton [D]Rep. John Connor [D]
Rep. Silvana Tabares [D]Rep. Carol Ammons [D]Rep. Linda LaVia [D]Rep. Ann Williams [D]
Rep. LaShawn Ford [D]Rep. Justin Slaughter [D]Rep. Will Guzzardi [D]Rep. Jaime Andrade [D]
Rep. Robert Martwick [D]Rep. Natalie Manley [D]Rep. Frances Hurley [D]Rep. Thaddeus Jones [D]
Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin [D]Rep. Theresa Mah [D]Rep. Mark Batinick [R]Sen. Linda Holmes [D]
Sen. Cristina Castro [D]Sen. Kwame Raoul [D]Sen. John Mulroe [D]Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D]
Sen. Iris Martinez [D]Sen. Don Harmon [D]Sen. Laura Murphy [D]Sen. Julie Morrison [D]
Sen. William Cunningham [D]Sen. Melinda Bush [D]Sen. Heather Steans [D]Sen. Daniel Biss [D]
Sen. Karen McConnaughay [R]Sen. Patricia Vanpelt-Watkins [D]Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D]Sen. Mattie Hunter [D]
Sen. David Koehler [D]Sen. Pamela Althoff [R]Sen. Andy Manar [D]Sen. Pat McGuire [D]
Sen. Toi Hutchinson [D]Sen. Terry Link [D]Sen. Emil Jones [D]Sen. Steve Stadelman [D]
Sen. Omar Aquino [D]Sen. James Clayborne [D]Sen. Elgie Sims [D]Sen. Tim Bivins [R]
Sen. Scott Bennett [D]Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D]

Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2018
2018-05-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2018
2018-05-22SenateDo Pass Education; 013-000-000
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Education
2018-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-04-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-002-000
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 010-004-000
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105527-9.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback