IL HB5148 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-4)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0684
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-4)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0684
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that course material and instruction in a sex education course shall include, with an emphasis on the workplace environment and life on a college campus, material and discussion on what constitutes sexual consent and what may be considered sexual harassment or sexual assault. Effective July 1, 2018.
Title
SCH CD-SEX ED-SEXUAL CONSENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0684 |
2018-08-03 | House | Effective Date August 3, 2018 |
2018-08-03 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-22 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-24 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2018 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 013-000-000 |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-04-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-002-000 |
2018-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 010-004-000 |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 27-9.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |