IL HB5147 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Child Labor Law. Provides that, before a child may be issued a permit to work as a model, a trust account must be established providing, at a minimum, that: at least 15% (or a greater percentage as determined by rule) of the gross earnings of the child model shall be deposited into the account; the funds in the account shall be available only to the child model; the funds shall be held by a bank, corporate fiduciary, or trust company, as those terms are defined in the Corporate Fiduciary Act; and the funds in the account shall become available to the child model upon the child model attaining the age of 18 years. Provides that the Department of Labor shall adopt rules to implement these provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CHILD LABOR-CHILD MODEL-TRUST

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 011-000-000
2018-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 102-000-000
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 025-000-000
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-04-16HouseFiscal Note Filed
2018-04-16HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2018-04-11HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2018-04-11HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2018-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Standard Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-012-000
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
82020512.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback