IL HB5145 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that, beginning with the 2018-2019 school year, a student in kindergarten may not receive an out-of-school suspension of 3 days or less for the student's disruption to other students' learning opportunities and may not receive an out-of-school suspension of longer than 3 days for substantially disrupting, impeding, or interfering with the operation of a school. Effective immediately.
Title
KINDERGARTEN-SCH SUSPENSION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-17 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2018-04-16 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000 |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-22.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5145&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5145.htm |