IL HB5144 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-20 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that, beginning with the 2018-2019 school year, a school board with a pupil attending an area secondary vocational school shall pay the vocational school tuition based upon the vocational school's per capita cost or the school district's per capita cost, whichever one is greater (instead of just the vocational school's per capita cost). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-VOCATIONAL SCH-TUITION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-17HouseFiscal Note Filed
2018-04-16HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-22.22Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback