IL HB5143 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Secretary of State shall include, in the Illinois Rules of the Road publication, information advising drivers to use the Dutch Reach method when opening a vehicle door. Provides that the Secretary of State shall include a test question concerning bicycle safety, of which one may be concerning the Dutch Reach method, in the question pool used for the written portion of the drivers license examination.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-DUTCH REACH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 87 N: 12 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 28, 2018
2018-05-25SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-05-25SenateDo Pass Transportation; 011-000-000
2018-05-24SenateWaive Posting Notice
2018-05-24SenateRe-referred to Transportation
2018-05-17SenateTo Subcommittee on Special Issues (TR)
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-09SenatePostponed - Transportation
2018-05-02SenatePostponed - Transportation
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Transportation
2018-04-24SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-04-19SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-19SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-19SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-19SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-04-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 087-012-000
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2018-04-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62552-112Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-109Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback