IL HB5142 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0799
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0799
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that, for tax years ending on or after December 31, 2022, all individual income tax returns shall contain an appropriate space in which the taxpayer may indicate that the taxpayer would like to know the taxpayer's eligibility for health insurance benefits and authorize the Department of Revenue to share the taxpayer's income information with the State health benefits exchange. Provides that, by June 1 and October 1 of each year, the Department of Healthcare and Family Services and the Department of Insurance shall provide the Department of Revenue with a form letter describing health insurance enrollment options for taxpayers. Provides that the form letter is not required in any calendar year if the State health benefits exchange is operational as of January 1 of that calendar year. Provides that the Department of Revenue shall send the form letter via e-mail or first class mail to the taxpayers who indicated on their most recent individual income tax return that they would like to know their eligibility for health insurance benefits. Provides that the marketplace enrollment platform must interface with the Department's tax system if the State transitions to a State health benefits exchange. Provides that the Director of Revenue shall make individual income tax information available to the State health benefits exchange if the disclosure is authorized by the taxpayer. Provides that the State health benefits exchange shall use the information provided by the Department to assess the individual taxpayer's eligibility for Medicaid and health insurance premium tax credits. Provides that the State health benefits exchange shall inform the taxpayer of the results of its eligibility assessment. Effective immediately.
Title
INS-EASY ENROLLMENT PROGRAM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 92 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 92 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0799 |
2022-05-13 | House | Effective Date May 13, 2022 |
2022-05-13 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-04-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-01 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2022 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 014-000-000 |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 4, 2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2022-03-04 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 092-011-000 |
2022-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2022-03-04 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2022-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2022-03-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 017-000-000 |
2022-03-02 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2022-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2022-02-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 016-000-000 |
2022-02-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 368h | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 5-2c | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 5 | 513 | New Code | See Bill Text |