IL HB5141 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0958
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Currency Exchange Act. Provides that within one year (rather than 3 years) after the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation's first published notice in a local newspaper regarding a community currency exchange filing for termination, the owners of the debts, liabilities, and lawful demands against such community currency exchange will be redeemed by the Secretary on demand in writing. Provides that after the expiration of the one-year period (rather than 3-year period), the Secretary shall return to the person or persons designated in the statement of termination to receive repayment. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CURRENCY EXCHANGE-PROPERTY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-19HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0958
2018-08-19HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 107-001-000
2018-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-24HouseArrived in House
2018-05-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2018-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Connelly
2018-05-24SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Financial Institutions; 005-000-000
2018-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions
2018-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Financial Institutions; 005-000-000
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Financial Institutions
2018-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Financial Institutions Committee; 009-000-000
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Financial Institutions Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20540515.2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback