IL HB5140 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Real Estate Appraiser Licensing Act of 2002 and Appraisal Management Company Registration Act. Provides that the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation may require participation in a third-party, multi-state licensing system for the licensing of certified general real estate appraisers, certified residential real estate appraisers, associate real estate trainee appraisers, and real estate appraisal education providers; and registration of appraisal management companies. Makes corresponding changes in both Acts. Provides that the multi-state licensing system may share regulatory information and maintain records in compliance with the provisions of the Acts. Provides that the multi-state licensing system may charge an applicant an administration fee that shall be paid directly to the system. Defines "multi-state licensing system". In provisions of the Real Estate Appraiser Licensing Act of 2002 concerning criminal history record checks, provides that the Secretary may designate a multi-state licensing system to perform the checks. Effective immediately.
Title
REAL ESTATE APPRAISERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-19 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. David A. Welter |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 008-000-000 |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 458 | 1-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 458 | 20-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 458 | 20-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 458 | 5-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 458 | 5-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 458 | 5-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 458 | 5-22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 458 | 5-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 458 | 5-55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 458 | 5-7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 459 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 459 | 32 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 459 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 459 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 459 | 55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5140&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5140.htm |