IL HB5137 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0769
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0769
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that the System shall offer a defined contribution benefit to active members of the System. Provides that the defined contribution benefit shall collect optional employee and optional employer contributions into an account and shall offer investment options to the participant. Provides that the defined contribution benefit shall be operated in full compliance with any applicable State and federal laws, and the System shall utilize generally accepted practices in creating and maintaining the benefit for the best interest of the participants. Authorizes the System to use funds from the employee and employer contributions to defray any and all costs of creating and maintaining the benefit. Requires the System to produce an annual report on the participation in the benefit and to make that report public. Excludes any benefit increase resulting from the change made by the amendatory Act from the definition of "new benefit increase". Effective immediately.
Title
PENCD-TRS-DEFINED CONTRIBUTION
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Martwick [D] | Rep. David Harris [R] | Rep. Mark Batinick [R] | Rep. Jaime Andrade [D] |
Sen. Dan McConchie [R] | Sen. Pamela Althoff [R] | Sen. Michael Connelly [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0769 |
2018-08-10 | House | Effective Date August 10, 2018 |
2018-08-10 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-22 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-24 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2018 |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 18, 2018 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 2, 2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2018-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 094-000-000 |
2018-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 014-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Personnel & Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-04-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-04-16 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-04-16 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 16-203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 16-204 | New Code | See Bill Text |