IL HB5136 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. With regard to the development of teacher evaluation plans, provides that, beginning with the first school year following the effective date of the amendatory Act, a joint committee (created by a school district to incorporate the use of data and indicators on student growth as a significant factor in rating teacher performance into the evaluation plan) shall meet no less than one time annually to assess and review the effectiveness of the district's evaluation plan for the purposes of continuous improvement of instruction and evaluation practices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCD CD-TEACHER EVALUATION PLAN

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Education; 009-000-000
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Education
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 076-016-000
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-27HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 005-003-000
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 005-003-000
2018-04-10HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-04-10HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-10HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105524A-4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback