IL HB5135 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that grant amounts under the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF) program may not vary on the basis of a TANF recipient's county of residence. Increases TANF grant amounts to: 30% of federal poverty guidelines beginning October 1, 2018; 40% of federal poverty guidelines beginning October 1, 2019; and 50% of federal poverty guidelines beginning October 1, 2020. Provides that beginning October 1, 2021, and each October 1 thereafter, TANF grant amounts shall be annually adjusted to remain equal to 50% of the most recent federal poverty guidelines for each family size. Provides that TANF grants for child-only assistance units shall be at least 75% of TANF grants for assistance units of the same size that consist of a caretaker relative with children. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TANF-GRANT AMOUNT INCREASES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-03-22HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-03-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-03-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-03-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
305512-4.11Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback