IL HB5131 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Motion Withdrawn Rep. Margo McDermed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. Provides that recreational or athletic program or facility personnel who are required to report child abuse must complete mandated reporter training by a provider or agency with expertise in recognizing and reporting child abuse. Enhances the criminal penalty for any person who knowingly and willfully violates certain reporting requirements for mandated reporters. Makes a violation a Class 4 felony (rather than a Class A misdemeanor for a first violation and a Class 4 felony for a second or subsequent violation), except that if the person acted as part of a plan or scheme having as its object the prevention of discovery of an abused or neglected child by lawful authorities for the purpose of protecting or insulating any person or entity from arrest or prosecution, the person commits a Class 3 felony (rather than a Class 4 felony for a first offense and a Class 3 felony for a second or subsequent offense). Enhances the criminal penalty for any other person required to report suspected child abuse or neglect who willfully fails to report such abuse or neglect by making it a Class 4 felony (rather than a Class A misdemeanor for a first violation and a Class 4 felony for a second or subsequent violation). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CHILD ABUSE-REPORTING-PENALTY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HouseMotion Withdrawn Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-10HouseMotion Filed to Discharge Committee Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-04-09HouseTo Sentencing, Penalties and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32554Amended CodeCitation Text
32554.02Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback