IL HB5130 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1234
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of State Police Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois and the Criminal Code of 1961. Provides that moneys and the sale proceeds distributed to the Department of State Police pursuant to the money laundering statute shall be deposited in a special fund in the State treasury to be known as the Money Laundering Asset Recovery Fund. Provides that the moneys deposited in the Money Laundering Asset Recovery Fund shall be appropriated to and administered by the Department of State Police for State law enforcement purposes. Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the Money Laundering Asset Recovery Fund in the State treasury. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MONEY LAUNDERING-FUND

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-07-23 Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1234
2010-07-23 Effective Date July 23, 2010
2010-07-23 Governor Approved
2010-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2010-04-29 Passed Both Houses
2010-04-29 Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2010-04-28 Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 29, 2010
2010-04-28 Second Reading
2010-04-22 Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 23, 2010
2010-04-22 Do Pass Criminal Law; 008-000-000
2010-04-13 Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan
2010-04-13 Assigned to Criminal Law
2010-04-05 Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Gary Forby
2010-03-10 Referred to Assignments
2010-03-10 First Reading
2010-03-10 Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Deanna Demuzio
2010-03-02 Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 3, 2010
2010-03-02 Arrive in Senate
2010-02-25 Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
2010-02-23 Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2010-02-23 Second Reading - Short Debate
2010-02-17 Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2010-02-17 Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 016-000-000
2010-02-17 House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
2010-02-17 House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by State Government Administration Committee
2010-02-08 Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
2010-01-29 Referred to Rules Committee
2010-01-29 First Reading
2010-01-27 Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay C. Hoffman

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback