IL HB5129 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Kelly
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Kelly
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax credit in an amount equal to 50% of the amount paid by the taxpayer during the taxable year for the purchase of a gun safe or lock used primarily for the purpose of securing firearms. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-GUN SAFES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Kelly |
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5129&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB5129.htm |