IL HB5123 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0628
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Provides that a county board in a county in which there is no city, village, or incorporated town with a board of election commissioners that has established a county board of election commissioners may, by ordinance or resolution, dissolve the county board of election commissioners and transfer its functions to the county clerk.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COUNTY BD ELEC COMMISSIONERS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-23HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0628
2018-07-23HouseEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-07-23HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-15HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-18HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-18SenateThird Reading - Passed; 041-000-000
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 8, 2018
2018-05-03SenateDo Pass Executive; 011-000-000
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-04-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2018-04-19SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-19SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-19SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-19SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 016-000-000
2018-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-03-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-03-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1056A-7Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback