IL HB5122 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the New Teacher Induction and Mentoring Article of the School Code. Changes the heading of the Article and the definition of "new teacher". Provides that, beginning with the 2022-2023 school year, the State Board of Education shall develop a program to provide grants to mentor training providers to establish a training program for new teacher mentors, and requires each public school to use a teacher induction and mentoring program provided by a mentor trained through a mentor training provider (rather than requiring a public school to develop a new teacher induction and mentoring program). Makes changes concerning program requirements, funding and stipends, the evaluation of programs, and obsolete references. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-MENTORING NEW TEACHERS
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Demmer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 21A-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21A-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21A-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21A-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21A-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21A-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21A-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | Art. 21A heading | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5122&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5122.htm |