IL HB5122 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-6)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Makes post-secondary education tuition and fee waivers available to youth for whom the Department of Children and Family Services has court-ordered legal responsibility, youth who aged out of care at age 18 or older, or youth formerly under care who have been adopted and were the subject of an adoption assistance agreement or who have been placed in private guardianship and were the subject of a subsidized guardianship agreement. Requires applicants to have earned a high school diploma from an accredited institution or a high school equivalency certificate or have met the State criteria for high school graduation before the start of the school year for which they are applying for the waivers. Limits the tuition and fee waivers to persons under the age of 26 and provides that waivers shall be available to a student for at least the first 5 years the student is enrolled in a community college, university, or college maintained by the State. Provides that the age requirement and 5-year cap on tuition and fee waivers shall be waived and eligibility extended for applicants or students who were unable to enroll in a qualifying post-secondary school or complete an academic term because the student: (i) was called into active duty with the United States Armed Forces; (ii) was deployed for service in the United States Public Health Service Commissioned Corps; or (iii) volunteered in the Peace Corps or the AmeriCorps. Permits the Department to provide the student with a stipend to cover maintenance and school expenses during the academic years to supplement the student's earnings. Requires the Department to develop outreach programs to ensure qualifying youths are aware of the availability of the tuition and fee waivers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DCFS-TUITION & FEE WAIVERS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018
2018-05-17SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateDo Pass Human Services; 006-004-000
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-09SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-04-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 096-015-000
2018-04-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-20HouseFiscal Note Filed
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Higher Education Committee; 012-000-000
2018-04-19HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-16HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-16HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-04-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-04-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-11HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-11HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Higher Education Committee; 014-006-000
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-09HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-04-09HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Appropriations-Higher Education Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-03-13HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-02-27HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
205058Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback