IL HB5120 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Comptroller Act. Provides that the Business Enterprise Council created under the Business Enterprise for Minorities, Women, and Persons with Disabilities Act shall provide the Comptroller with information necessary to fulfill the Comptroller's responsibilities with respect to the Minority Contractor Opportunity Initiative. Provides that the Comptroller shall annually prepare and submit a report to the Governor and the General Assembly concerning the progress of the initiative for the preceding fiscal year (rather than calendar year). Provides that each Chief Procurement Officer shall provide to the Comptroller information necessary to fulfill the Comptroller's responsibilities with respect to the Minority Contractor Opportunity Initiative. Makes a conforming changes. Amends the Business Enterprise for Minorities, Women, and Persons with Disabilities Act. Adds the State Comptroller to the Business Enterprise Council for Minorities, Women, and Persons with Disabilities. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COMPTRLLER-MINORITY CONTRACTOR

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 005-002-000
2018-04-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2018-04-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2018-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2018-03-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2018-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1540523.9Amended CodeCitation Text
305755Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback