IL HB5119 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Administrative Review Law of the Code of Civil Procedure. In the definition of "administrative decision", changes references to "parties" to "persons". Provides that administrative decisions made reviewable by statute and final administrative decisions for which there is no other adequate remedy in a court are subject to judicial review. Provides that a person suffering legal wrong because of an administrative decision, or adversely affected or aggrieved by an administrative decision, is entitled to judicial review of the administrative decision. Provides that the Administrative Review Law shall apply to and govern every action to review judicially a final decision of any administrative agency unless the action is governed by the procedures or provisions of another statute. Strikes language concerning the scope of the Administrative Review Law. Provides that every action to review a final administrative decision shall be commenced by the filing of a complaint and the issuance of summons within 60 (instead of 35) days from the date that a copy of the decision sought to be reviewed was served upon the party affected by the decision. Makes other changes in Sections concerning commencement of action; defendants; scope of review; powers of the circuit court; and direct review of administrative orders by the appellate court. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW-VARIOUS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-03-07HouseTo Civil Procedure Subcommittee
2018-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2018-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Steven A. Andersson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73553-101Amended CodeCitation Text
73553-101.5New CodeSee Bill Text
73553-102Amended CodeCitation Text
73553-103Amended CodeCitation Text
73553-107Amended CodeCitation Text
73553-110Amended CodeCitation Text
73553-111Amended CodeCitation Text
73553-113Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback