IL HB5113 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Workers' Compensation Act. Provides that beginning January 1, 2019, employers must report injuries resulting in the loss of 3 or more calendar days of work to the Commission, the employee, and the employer's insurer. Imposes penalties for noncompliance. Requires the Commission to mail to the injured worker information on how to access the handbook on the rights and obligations of employees and employers. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WORKERS COMP INJURY REPORTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-11HouseTo Workers Compensation Subcommittee
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8203056Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback