IL HB5112 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a prosecution for criminal sexual assault, aggravated criminal sexual assault, or aggravated criminal sexual abuse may be commenced at any time (rather than within 10 years of the commission of the offense if the victim reported the offense to law enforcement authorities within 3 years after the commission of the offense). Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM PROSECUTIONS-SEX OFFENSES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-05-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-05-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-05-10HouseMotion Withdrawn Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-12HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-04-12HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-10HouseMotion Filed to Discharge Committee Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2018-04-09HouseTo Sex Offenses and Sex Offender Registration Subcommittee
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
72053-5Amended CodeCitation Text
72053-6Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback