IL HB5111 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Behavioral Health Workforce Act. Creates the Behavioral Health Education Center, administered by a teaching or research State university, or both. Provides that the Center shall be operational on or before July 1, 2019. Provides that the Center shall: (1) provide funds for 2 additional medical residents in a State-based psychiatry program each year beginning July 1, 2019 until a total of 8 additional psychiatry residents are added in 2022; (2) provide funds for 5 one-year doctoral-level psychology internships, master social workers, and master level clinical professional counselors in this State within 12 months after the effective date of this Act and every year thereafter and increase the number of interns in the program to 10 within 36 months after the effective date of this Act. Provides that the interns shall be placed in communities so as to increase access to behavioral health services for patients residing in rural and underserved areas of this State; and (3) beginning July 1, 2020, develop 5 behavioral health interdisciplinary training sites each year until a total of 20 sites have been developed. Provides that 10 of the 20 sites shall be in counties with a population of fewer than 50,000 inhabitants. Requires the Center to perform other duties. Provides that no later than December 1 of every odd-numbered year, the Center shall prepare a report of its activities under the Behavioral Health Workforce Act. Provides that the report shall be filed electronically with the General Assembly and shall be provided electronically to any member of the General Assembly upon request.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BEHAVIORAL HLTH WORKFORCE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang
2018-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Mental Health Committee; 022-000-000
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Mental Health Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback