IL HB5110 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0766
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0766
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Clinical Social Work and Social Work Practice Act and the Professional Counselor and Clinical Professional Counselor Licensing and Practice Act. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation shall (rather than may) issue a license as a clinical social worker, social worker, professional counselor, or clinical professional counselor, without the required examination, to an applicant licensed under the laws of another jurisdiction if the requirements for licensure in that jurisdiction are, on the date of licensure, substantially equivalent to the requirements under the Act or to any person who, at the time of his or her licensure, possessed individual qualifications that were substantially equivalent to the requirements then in force in this State. Requires the Department to issue the license not more than 60 days after a completed application is received by the Department. Effective immediately.
Title
SOCIAL WORK/COUNSELOR-LICENSE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0766 |
2018-08-10 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-10 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-15 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-18 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 042-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Mental Health Committee; 013-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Mental Health Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Mental Health Committee; 022-000-000 |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-02-26 | House | Assigned to Mental Health Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 107 | 70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 20 | 12.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |