IL HB5110 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0766
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Clinical Social Work and Social Work Practice Act and the Professional Counselor and Clinical Professional Counselor Licensing and Practice Act. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation shall (rather than may) issue a license as a clinical social worker, social worker, professional counselor, or clinical professional counselor, without the required examination, to an applicant licensed under the laws of another jurisdiction if the requirements for licensure in that jurisdiction are, on the date of licensure, substantially equivalent to the requirements under the Act or to any person who, at the time of his or her licensure, possessed individual qualifications that were substantially equivalent to the requirements then in force in this State. Requires the Department to issue the license not more than 60 days after a completed application is received by the Department. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SOCIAL WORK/COUNSELOR-LICENSE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-10HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0766
2018-08-10HouseEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-10HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-15HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-18HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-18SenateThird Reading - Passed; 042-000-000
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-000-000
2018-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Mental Health Committee; 013-000-000
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Mental Health Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang
2018-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Mental Health Committee; 022-000-000
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Mental Health Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22510770Amended CodeCitation Text
2252012.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback