IL HB5109 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-15 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Community Behavioral Health Care Professional Loan Repayment Program Act. Creates the Community Behavioral Health Care Professional Loan Repayment Program to be administered by the Illinois Student Assistance Commission. Provides that the Program shall provide loan assistance, subject to appropriation, to eligible mental health and substance use professionals practicing in a community mental health center in an underserved or rural federally designated Mental Health Professional Shortage Area. Provides that applicants must enter into a minimum 2-year contract. Provides that the Commission may extend the contract a third or fourth year to individual applicants upon completion of the initial 2-year obligation. Provides that the Commission may extend the contract a third or fourth year to individual applicants upon completion of the initial 2-year obligation. Provides that Program participants who, for any reason, fail to begin or complete the required period of obligated service shall be liable to the Commission for an amount equal to the number of months of obligated service not completed multiplied by $2,500 and interest on the amount at the maximum legal prevailing rate, as determined by the Treasurer of the United States from the date of breach.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COMMUNITY BEHAV HEALTH CARE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-15HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-24SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-05-18HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-18SenateThird Reading - Passed; 042-000-000
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Human Services; 009-000-000
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-000-000
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Mental Health Committee; 017-000-000
2018-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Mental Health Committee
2018-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang
2018-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Mental Health Committee
2018-03-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang
2018-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Mental Health Committee; 022-000-000
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Mental Health Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback