IL HB5109 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Mental Health Committee; 017-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Community Behavioral Health Care Professional Loan Repayment Program Act. Creates the Community Behavioral Health Care Professional Loan Repayment Program to be administered by the Illinois Student Assistance Commission. Provides that the Program shall provide loan assistance, subject to appropriation, to eligible mental health and substance use professionals practicing in a community mental health center in an underserved or rural federally designated Mental Health Professional Shortage Area. Provides that applicants must enter into a minimum 2-year contract. Provides that the Commission may extend the contract a third or fourth year to individual applicants upon completion of the initial 2-year obligation. Provides that the Commission may extend the contract a third or fourth year to individual applicants upon completion of the initial 2-year obligation. Provides that Program participants who, for any reason, fail to begin or complete the required period of obligated service shall be liable to the Commission for an amount equal to the number of months of obligated service not completed multiplied by $2,500 and interest on the amount at the maximum legal prevailing rate, as determined by the Treasurer of the United States from the date of breach.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COMMUNITY BEHAV HEALTH CARE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Mental Health Committee; 017-000-000
2018-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Mental Health Committee
2018-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang
2018-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Mental Health Committee
2018-03-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang
2018-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Mental Health Committee; 022-000-000
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Mental Health Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback