IL HB5104 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Vetoed on August 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-14 - Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Deletes provision that the Department of Corrections shall require the committed person receiving medical or dental services on a non-emergency basis to pay a $5 co-payment to the Department for each visit for medical or dental services. Provides that if a Department facility maintains a commissary or commissaries serving inmates, the selling prices for all goods shall be sufficient to cover the costs of the goods and an additional charge of up to 10% (rather than 35% for tobacco products and up to 25% for non-tobacco products). Deletes provisions that the Department shall notify the Attorney General of the existence of any proceeds which it believes should be applied towards a satisfaction, in whole or in part, of the person's incarceration costs. Deletes provision that of the compensation earned for work assignments, a portion, as determined by the Department, shall be used to offset the cost of the committed person's incarceration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CD CORR-INMATE CO-PAY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-14 - House - Motion in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-14SenateMotion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-11-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Amendatory Veto November 15, 2018
2018-11-14HouseOverride Amendatory Veto - House Passed 109-000-000
2018-11-14House3/5 Vote Required
2018-11-14HouseMotion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-11-13HousePlaced on Calendar Amendatory Veto
2018-08-21HouseGovernor Amendatory Veto
2018-06-22HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-24HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 030-020-000
2018-05-24SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Human Services; 006-002-000
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-04-27HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-001
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2018-04-27HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-25HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Health & Healthcare Disparities Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health & Healthcare Disparities Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-20HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-20HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-19HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-19HouseFiscal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-17HouseCorrectional Note Filed
2018-04-16HouseCorrectional Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-16HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-16HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Health & Healthcare Disparities Committee; 004-001-000
2018-03-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Health & Healthcare Disparities Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73053-12-1Amended CodeCitation Text
73053-12-2Amended CodeCitation Text
73053-12-5Amended CodeCitation Text
73053-6-2Amended CodeCitation Text
73053-7-2aAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5104&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5104.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5104eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5104enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5104gms.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5104ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5104ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5104ham003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB5104_04272018_003000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB5104_05242018_041000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB5104_11142018_015000M.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback