IL HB5101 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. In provisions concerning services provided by electric utilities to alternative retail electric suppliers, requires that customers are enrolled with an alternative retail electric supplier through the municipal aggregation process described in the Illinois Power Agency Act when certain electric utilities file a tariff. Creates a natural gas aggregation process by municipalities, townships, and counties. Provides that the corporate authorities of a municipality, township board, or county board of a county may adopt an ordinance under which it may aggregate residential and small commercial retail natural gas loads located within the municipality, township, or county and may enter into service agreements to facilitate for those loads the sale and purchase of natural gas and related services and equipment. Provides that a single billing option shall be offered to customers for both the services provided by the alternative gas supplier and the delivery services provided by the gas utility, provided that the customers are enrolled with the natural gas aggregation process. Requires a gas utility to file a tariff that allows alternative gas suppliers to issue single bills to residential and small commercials customers, provided that the customers are enrolled with the natural gas aggregation process. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
UTILITY-ELECTRIC/NATURAL GAS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-24 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 020-000-000 |
2018-04-09 | House | Remains in Public Utilities Committee |
2018-04-09 | House | Motion Do Pass - Lost Public Utilities Committee; 010-006-000 |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2018-02-26 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 16-101A | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-118 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 19-107 | New Code | See Bill Text |
220 | 5 | 19-135 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5101&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5101.htm |