IL HB5098 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0969
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0969
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Requires notice to be given to the Department of Transportation by the corporate authority of a municipality initiating annexation, disconnection and annexation, or disconnection under Article 7 of the Code.
Title
MUNI-ANNEX/DISCONNECT NOTICE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0969 |
2022-05-27 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-05-27 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-05-05 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 6, 2022 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 5, 2022 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 019-000-000 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Diane Pappas |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2022-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 011-000-000 |
2022-03-01 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) March 31, 2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 7-1-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |