IL HB5097 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Professional Regulation Law. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation shall not prohibit a person from receiving a license solely because the person is not a citizen of the United States. Provides that the Department may grant a license to a person who satisfies specific requirements regarding immigration status and fulfills other necessary requirements to obtain a license. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DFPR LICENSE-NON-CITIZENS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-17HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
2018-05-17HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Standard Debate
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-05-14HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-05-14HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-17HouseFiscal Note Filed
2018-04-16HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2018-04-11HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-11HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Standard Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 005-004-000
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2021052105-15Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback