IL HB5093 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on November 28 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Illinois Information Security Improvement Act. Creates the Office of the Statewide Chief Information Security Officer within the Department of Innovation and Technology. Provides for the duties and powers of the Office. Creates the position of Statewide Chief Information Security Officer to serve as the head of the Office. Provides for the qualifications, powers, and duties of the Statewide Chief Information Security Officer, and for the appointment of the Statewide Chief Information Security Officer by the Secretary of Innovation and Technology. Defines terms. Effective January 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IL INFO SECURITY IMPROVEMENT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-28HousePassed Both Houses
2018-11-28SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2018-11-28Senate3/5 Vote Required
2018-11-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 28, 2018
2018-11-27SenateSecond Reading
2018-11-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-11-27SenateDo Pass State Government; 007-000-000
2018-11-21SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-11-20SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-11-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-11-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-11-14SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-11-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-11-14SenateArrive in Senate
2018-11-14HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2018-11-14House3/5 Vote Required
2018-11-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-11-14HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-07HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 008-000-000
2018-05-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee
2018-05-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-05-14HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-14HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 011-000-000
2018-04-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-04-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2018-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2018-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback