IL HB5093 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1169
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1169
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Illinois Information Security Improvement Act. Creates the Office of the Statewide Chief Information Security Officer within the Department of Innovation and Technology. Provides for the duties and powers of the Office. Creates the position of Statewide Chief Information Security Officer to serve as the head of the Office. Provides for the qualifications, powers, and duties of the Statewide Chief Information Security Officer, and for the appointment of the Statewide Chief Information Security Officer by the Secretary of Innovation and Technology. Defines terms. Effective January 1, 2019.
Title
IL INFO SECURITY IMPROVEMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-11-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-04 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1169 |
2019-01-04 | House | Effective Date January 4, 2019 |
2019-01-04 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-12-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-11-28 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 28, 2018 |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 007-000-000 |
2018-11-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-11-20 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-11-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-11-14 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2018-11-14 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-11-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-07 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 008-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee |
2018-05-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-05-14 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-14 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2018-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2018-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2018-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |