IL HB5093 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-26 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 1961. Provides that a person committed to the Department of Human Services charged with the commission of a felony and determined unfit to stand trial or found not guilty by reason of insanity of a felony who intentionally escapes from any Department of Human Services facility or from the custody of an employee of that facility commits a Class 2 felony. Provides that a person committed to the Department of Human Services charged with the commission of a misdemeanor and determined unfit to stand trial or found not guilty by reason of insanity of a misdemeanor who intentionally escapes from any Department of Human Services facility or from the custody of an employee of that facility commits a Class A misdemeanor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-ESCAPE DHS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-26 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2010-02-23 Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2010-02-23 Second Reading - Short Debate
2010-02-18 Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2010-02-18 Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000
2010-02-09 Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
2010-01-29 Referred to Rules Committee
2010-01-29 First Reading
2010-01-26 Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr.

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback