IL HB5089 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Departments of State Government Law. Changes the head of the Department of State Police from Director of State Police to Superintendent of State Police. Provides that any reference to the Director or Assistant Director of State Police in the Illinois Compiled Statutes or the Administrative Code shall be interpreted to mean the Superintendent or Assistant Superintendent of State Police. Provides that the Superintendent of State Police must either be a current sworn State Police officer or a sworn State Police officer who retired in good standing. Provides that if the Superintendent is a sworn State Police officer who retired in good standing, that person shall both receive an annual salary and continue to receive his or her retirement annuity. Amends the Department of State Police Law to provide for duties of the Office of the Superintendent of State Police, including appointment of an Assistant Superintendent and a Chief of Staff. Amends the State Employee Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Establishes a defined contribution plan for Superintendents of State Police who receive a retirement annuity during their service in that capacity. Adds provisions concerning employee and employer contributions, vesting, investment options, and qualified plan status. Provides that an annuitant who serves as the Superintendent of State Police is excluded from provisions requiring the suspension of a retirement annuity of a person who re-enters service. Makes related and conforming changes throughout the Illinois Compiled Statutes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE POLICE SUPERINTENDENT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2026052605-140Amended CodeCitation Text
2026052605-200Amended CodeCitation Text
2026052605-25Amended CodeCitation Text
2026052605-250Amended CodeCitation Text
2026052605-30Amended CodeCitation Text
2026052605-35Amended CodeCitation Text
2026052605-375Amended CodeCitation Text
2026052605-40Amended CodeCitation Text
2026052605-400Amended CodeCitation Text
2026052605-405Amended CodeCitation Text
2026052605-45Amended CodeCitation Text
2026052605-485Amended CodeCitation Text
2026052605-5Amended CodeCitation Text
2026052605-51New CodeSee Bill Text
2026052605-55Amended CodeCitation Text
2026052605-605Amended CodeCitation Text
2026052605-90Amended CodeCitation Text
2026052605-95Amended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in partAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a-1Amended CodeCitation Text
20260555a-2Amended CodeCitation Text
20260555a-3Amended CodeCitation Text
20260555a-4Amended CodeCitation Text
20260555a-5Amended CodeCitation Text
2026101Amended CodeCitation Text
20261010Amended CodeCitation Text
20261013Amended CodeCitation Text
20261014Amended CodeCitation Text
20261018Amended CodeCitation Text
2026102Amended CodeCitation Text
20261021Amended CodeCitation Text
20261022Amended CodeCitation Text
20261023Amended CodeCitation Text
2026108Amended CodeCitation Text
2026109Amended CodeCitation Text
20261510Amended CodeCitation Text
2026201Amended CodeCitation Text
2026203Amended CodeCitation Text
2026204Amended CodeCitation Text
2026207Amended CodeCitation Text
2026209Amended CodeCitation Text
2026301Amended CodeCitation Text
20263517Amended CodeCitation Text
2026353Amended CodeCitation Text
2026356Amended CodeCitation Text
2026359Amended CodeCitation Text
20264010Amended CodeCitation Text
2026405Amended CodeCitation Text
20264510Amended CodeCitation Text
2026455Amended CodeCitation Text
20393015Amended CodeCitation Text
2039304Amended CodeCitation Text
2039802Amended CodeCitation Text
2039852001Amended CodeCitation Text
2040053Amended CodeCitation Text
2040054Amended CodeCitation Text
20404010Amended CodeCitation Text
20408510Amended CodeCitation Text
2054Amended CodeCitation Text
2055-180Repealed CodeCitation Text
2055-20Amended CodeCitation Text
2055-240New CodeSee Bill Text
2055-410Amended CodeCitation Text
2059.11Amended CodeCitation Text
20502510Amended CodeCitation Text
2050855Amended CodeCitation Text
20509010Amended CodeCitation Text
2051155Amended CodeCitation Text
2056852Amended CodeCitation Text
2056853Amended CodeCitation Text
2056854Amended CodeCitation Text
2056855Amended CodeCitation Text
2056856Amended CodeCitation Text
2056858Amended CodeCitation Text
2254665Amended CodeCitation Text
235510-1Amended CodeCitation Text
251355.04Amended CodeCitation Text
301056z-82Amended CodeCitation Text
302302Amended CodeCitation Text
307152.01Amended CodeCitation Text
307154Amended CodeCitation Text
307155Amended CodeCitation Text
307155.1Amended CodeCitation Text
307156Amended CodeCitation Text
325402Amended CodeCitation Text
325406Amended CodeCitation Text
325408Amended CodeCitation Text
40514-103.10Amended CodeCitation Text
40514-108.4Amended CodeCitation Text
40514-110Amended CodeCitation Text
40514-111Amended CodeCitation Text
40514-155.1New CodeSee Bill Text
41053515.1Amended CodeCitation Text
430504Amended CodeCitation Text
4306510Amended CodeCitation Text
4306511Amended CodeCitation Text
4306513.3Amended CodeCitation Text
4306515bAmended CodeCitation Text
430665Amended CodeCitation Text
4306687Amended CodeCitation Text
53501Amended CodeCitation Text
507053Amended CodeCitation Text
507257.5Amended CodeCitation Text
625511-501.2Amended CodeCitation Text
625511-501.8Amended CodeCitation Text
62553-648Amended CodeCitation Text
62554-109Amended CodeCitation Text
62554-302Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-106.1aAmended CodeCitation Text
625655Amended CodeCitation Text
70510527.3aAmended CodeCitation Text
7054051-3Amended CodeCitation Text
7054055-105Amended CodeCitation Text
720514-3Amended CodeCitation Text
720517-6.3Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-1.1Amended CodeCitation Text
720529B-1Amended CodeCitation Text
720536-1.1Amended CodeCitation Text
720536-1.3Amended CodeCitation Text
720536-2.2Amended CodeCitation Text
720536-7Amended CodeCitation Text
72055013Amended CodeCitation Text
72055014Amended CodeCitation Text
7205503Amended CodeCitation Text
72064610Amended CodeCitation Text
72515015Amended CodeCitation Text
7251503.1Amended CodeCitation Text
7251503.3Amended CodeCitation Text
7251505.1Amended CodeCitation Text
72520210Amended CodeCitation Text
72520220Amended CodeCitation Text
72520243Amended CodeCitation Text
7255108B-13Amended CodeCitation Text
7255124B-705Amended CodeCitation Text
7255124B-710Amended CodeCitation Text
7255124B-930Amended CodeCitation Text
73014845Amended CodeCitation Text
7301507Amended CodeCitation Text
73015440Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-4-3Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-5.5-40Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1.15Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1.4Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1.9Amended CodeCitation Text
735521-103Amended CodeCitation Text
8054055Amended CodeCitation Text
8153256.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback