IL HB5088 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of State Police Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of State Police is divided into the Office of the Statewide 9-1-1 Administrator (removes the Illinois State Police Academy) and 5 divisions (rather than 4 divisions): the Division of Patrol (rather than the Division of Operations), the Division of Investigation, the Division of Forensic Services, the Division of Administration, and the Division of Internal Investigation. Provides that for each Division, the Director of State Police shall appoint one Deputy Director and one Assistant Deputy Director. Provides that the position of Deputy Director may be given an appointed rank of Colonel and the Assistant Deputy Director may be given an appointed rank of Lieutenant Colonel. Eliminates the Office of Coordination of Gang Prevention in the Division of Operations. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE POLICE ORGANIZATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2605 | 2605-125 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 2605 | 2605-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2605 | 2605-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2605 | 2605-300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2605 | 2605-330 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2605 | 2605-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2605 | 2605-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2605 | 2605-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2605 | 2605-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2605 | 2605-52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2605 | 55a in part | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2605 | 55a-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2605 | 55a-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2605 | 55a-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2605 | 55a-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2605 | 55a-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2605 | 55a-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5088&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5088.htm |