IL HB5085 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Includes catalytic converters as an essential part of a vehicle. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that theft of property not from the person and not exceeding $500 in value is a Class 4 felony if the theft was of a catalytic converter and the value of the catalytic converter does not exceed $500 in value. Provides that theft of property exceeding $500 and not exceeding $10,000 in value is a Class 2 felony if the theft was of a catalytic converter and the value of the catalytic converter exceeds $500 in value. Provides that a person commits criminal damage to property when he or she knowingly damages a vehicle of another with intent to take a catalytic converter. Provides that it is an affirmative defense if the owner of the damaged property consented to the damage. Provides that knowingly damaging a vehicle of another with intent to take a catalytic converter is (i) a Class 4 felony when the damage to property does not exceed $500 or (ii) a Class 2 felony when the damage to property exceeds $500.
Title
CRIM CD-CATALYTIC CONVERTERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 1-118 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 16-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 21-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5085&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB5085.htm |